Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 316 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 4662 Month
» 71524 Year
» 1736900 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3019
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5482   22/01/1938
B7 5471   03/02/1940
B7 5480   07/11/1942
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 07/04/1945
B7 1362   24/05/1947