Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 893 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5520 Week
» 7258 Month
» 134701 Year
» 1800077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #263
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 468   03/1922
B7 5036   27/10/1928
B7 5035   22/10/1932
B8 5004 GLENALMOND 13/10/1934
B7 5037   11/01/1936
B7 5470   26/02/1938
B7 5461   25/11/1939