Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 48 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4540 Week
» 29374 Month
» 63706 Year
» 1729082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #354
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5482   22/12/1923
B8 5004 GLENALMOND 03/05/1930
B7 5036   27/08/1932
B7 5035   11/08/1934
B7 5458   21/03/1936
B8 5446 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 16/07/1938
B7 5458   29/06/1940