Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3518 Week
» 28352 Month
» 62684 Year
» 1728060 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3006
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5462   17/08/1935
B7 5036   06/05/1939
B7 5476   22/06/1940
B7 5034   14/11/1942
B8 5442   04/11/1944
B7 1396   22/02/1947