Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 927 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3233 Week
» 28067 Month
» 62399 Year
» 1727775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #554
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5471   27/09/1924
B7 5038   05/03/1932
B7 5475   06/01/1934
B7 5038   12/10/1935
B7 5475   22/05/1937
B8 5440   15/11/1941