Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3009
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
13 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
B7 |
5478 |
|
01/02/1936 |
B7 |
5481 |
|
27/11/1937 |
B7 |
5473 |
|
10/12/1938 |
B7 |
5032 |
|
12/10/1940 |
B8 |
5442 |
|
01/08/1942 |
B7 |
5458 |
|
02/12/1944 |
B7 |
1382 |
|
22/03/1947 |
|