Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 305 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1213 Week
» 12358 Month
» 112143 Year
» 1777519 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3016
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B8 5440   05/06/1937
B7 5469   14/10/1939
B7 5462   25/01/1941
B7 5469   26/09/1942
B8 5443   04/03/1944
B7 5484   02/03/1946