Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 315 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1156 Week
» 15092 Month
» 142535 Year
» 1807911 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3026
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5465   14/10/1939
B7 5467   26/04/1941
B7 5464   30/01/1943
B7 5033   08/04/1944
B7 1393   09/11/1946