Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 295 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5014 Week
» 16159 Month
» 115944 Year
» 1781320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3018
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5035   18/12/1937
B8 5439 SUTTON NELTHORPE 10/02/1940
B7 5472   08/05/1943
B7 5477   28/04/1945
B7 1375   01/03/1947