Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 397 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5384 Week
» 13499 Month
» 140942 Year
» 1806318 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #928
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5468   16/06/1934
B8 5439 SUTTON NELTHORPE 11/12/1937
B8 5442   10/03/1940
B7 5476   26/09/1942
B7 5034   14/10/1944
B8 1357 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR 03/05/1947