Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 634 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1542 Week
» 12687 Month
» 112472 Year
» 1777848 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3028
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5484   02/12/1939
B7 5475   12/07/1941
B8 5280   07/08/1943
B7 5469   06/10/1945
B7 1391   28/02/1948