Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 23 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1933 Week
» 2872 Month
» 206362 Year
» 1871738 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3012
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 13
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B7 5474   11/07/1936
B7 5472   24/09/1938
B7 5473   21/09/1940
B7 5470   06/11/1943
B7 5031   26/01/1946