Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 142 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1211 Week
» 1211 Month
» 68073 Year
» 1733449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #684
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6097 IMMINGHAM 22/05/1926
B4 6099   02/05/1931
B4 6095   03/06/1933
B4 6103   06/04/1935
B4 6095   25/12/1937
B4 6104   13/04/1940
B4 6102   06/03/1943
B4 6099   09/12/1944