Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 62 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4554 Week
» 29388 Month
» 63720 Year
» 1729096 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #797
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6103   10/01/1931
B4 6099   11/05/1935
B4 6103   13/02/1937
B4 6095   28/10/1939