Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 123 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2288 Week
» 2288 Month
» 69150 Year
» 1734526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #122
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 16Sup
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B4 6101   25/06/1927
B4 6104   12/02/1938
B4 6099   27/04/1940
B4 6103   10/07/1943