Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3110 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16516 Week
» 69532 Month
» 189059 Year
» 3215912 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2613
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4016 |
KNIGHT OF THE GOLDEN FLEECE |
20/03/1934 |
Castle |
4073 |
CAERPHILLY CASTLE |
02/04/1946 |
Castle |
5048 |
EARL OF DEVON |
03/01/1950 |
Castle |
5058 |
EARL OF CLANCARTY |
20/06/1951 |
Castle |
5003 |
LULWORTH CASTLE |
30/11/1953 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
27/10/1954 |
Castle |
4080 |
POWDERHAM CASTLE |
08/04/1957 |
|