Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 337 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18140 Week
» 71156 Month
» 190683 Year
» 3217536 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2386
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
12/06/1929 |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
03/04/1930 |
Castle |
5013 |
ABERGAVENNY CASTLE |
30/12/1935 |
Castle |
5026 |
CRICCIETH CASTLE |
23/04/1937 |
Castle |
5030 |
SHIRBURN CASTLE |
15/02/1939 |
Castle |
5006 |
TREGENNA CASTLE |
19/05/1943 |
Castle |
5035 |
COITY CASTLE |
22/09/1944 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
29/08/1945 |
Castle |
5090 |
NEATH ABBEY |
16/06/1953 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
06/07/1956 |
Castle |
7014 |
CAERHAYS CASTLE |
25/02/1963 |
|