Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 808 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18611 Week
» 71627 Month
» 191154 Year
» 3218007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2724
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
10/06/1937 |
Castle |
5001 |
LLANDOVERY CASTLE |
13/02/1941 |
Castle |
5041 |
TIVERTON CASTLE |
21/10/1947 |
Castle |
5044 |
EARL OF DUNRAVEN |
21/10/1947 |
Castle |
5004 |
LLANSTEPHAN CASTLE |
17/03/1949 |
Castle |
5027 |
FARLEIGH CASTLE |
04/11/1950 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
17/05/1952 |
Castle |
5093 |
UPTON CASTLE |
19/11/1952 |
Castle |
4075 |
CARDIFF CASTLE |
20/04/1954 |
Castle |
4074 |
CALDICOT CASTLE |
01/04/1957 |
|