Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 5117 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20729 Week
» 119374 Month
» 322038 Year
» 3348891 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2893
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5033 |
BROUGHTON CASTLE |
16/06/1942 |
Castle |
5042 |
WINCHESTER CASTLE |
09/03/1946 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
21/05/1946 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
09/05/1949 |
Castle |
5038 |
MORLAIS CASTLE |
24/02/1958 |
Castle |
7008 |
SWANSEA CASTLE |
04/06/1959 |
|