Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1519 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19322 Week
» 72338 Month
» 191865 Year
» 3218718 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4066
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7024 |
POWIS CASTLE |
30/06/1949 |
Castle |
5043 |
EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE |
08/12/1952 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
08/12/1954 |
Castle |
7019 |
FOWEY CASTLE |
03/10/1956 |
Castle |
5060 |
EARL OF BERKELEY |
06/12/1957 |
Castle |
4076 |
CARMARTHEN CASTLE |
30/07/1959 |
Castle |
7029 |
CLUN CASTLE |
07/10/1959 |
Castle |
5032 |
USK CASTLE |
23/04/1960 |
|