Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4938 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20550 Week
» 119195 Month
» 321859 Year
» 3348712 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2583
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5008 |
RAGLAN CASTLE |
23/06/1933 |
Castle |
111 |
VISCOUNT CHURCHILL |
06/03/1937 |
Castle |
5050 |
EARL OF ST GERMANS |
01/03/1939 |
Castle |
5083 |
BATH ABBEY |
23/06/1939 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
02/05/1941 |
Castle |
5096 |
BRIDGWATER CASTLE |
19/04/1945 |
Castle |
5051 |
EARL BATHURST |
24/05/1947 |
Castle |
4082 |
WINDSOR CASTLE |
31/08/1948 |
Castle |
5014 |
GOODRICH CASTLE |
25/02/1949 |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
09/10/1951 |
Castle |
5071 |
SPITFIRE |
05/08/1952 |
Castle |
7021 |
HAVERFORDWEST CASTLE |
06/08/1953 |
Castle |
5055 |
EARL OF ELDON |
28/07/1954 |
Castle |
5068 |
BEVERSTON CASTLE |
15/06/1955 |
Castle |
4081 |
WARWICK CASTLE |
10/05/1956 |
Castle |
5028 |
LLANTILIO CASTLE |
22/03/1958 |
|