Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1353 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19156 Week
» 72172 Month
» 191699 Year
» 3218552 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4003
Type |
Hawksworth 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
47t 6cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5016 |
MONTGOMERY CASTLE |
29/10/1946 |
Castle |
4085 |
BERKELEY CASTLE |
12/12/1946 |
Castle |
5064 |
BISHOP'S CASTLE |
03/10/1950 |
Castle |
5053 |
EARL CAIRNS |
11/12/1952 |
Castle |
4000 |
NORTH STAR |
01/04/1954 |
Castle |
5057 |
EARL WALDEGRAVE |
08/06/1954 |
Castle |
5063 |
EARL BALDWIN |
19/06/1955 |
|