Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 393 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14436 Week
» 79390 Month
» 282054 Year
» 3308907 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2733
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5021 |
WHITTINGTON CASTLE |
23/08/1937 |
Castle |
4098 |
KIDWELLY CASTLE |
12/11/1938 |
Castle |
5020 |
TREMATON CASTLE |
20/06/1939 |
Castle |
4089 |
DONNINGTON CASTLE |
26/12/1953 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
22/04/1958 |
|