Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1288 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14694 Week
» 67710 Month
» 187237 Year
» 3214090 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2700
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
03/02/1947 |
Castle |
5064 |
BISHOP'S CASTLE |
20/09/1948 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
04/11/1950 |
Castle |
4037 |
THE SOUTH WALES BORDERERS |
04/07/1952 |
Castle |
4090 |
DORCHESTER CASTLE |
03/07/1953 |
Castle |
5025 |
CHIRK CASTLE |
07/04/1955 |
|