Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2047 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19850 Week
» 72866 Month
» 192393 Year
» 3219246 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #4017
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
7005 |
LAMPHEY CASTLE |
25/06/1946 |
Castle |
4092 |
DUNRAVEN CASTLE |
18/08/1948 |
Castle |
5061 |
EARL OF BIRKENHEAD |
24/01/1949 |
Castle |
5070 |
SIR DANIEL GOOCH |
12/10/1949 |
Castle |
7028 |
CADBURY CASTLE |
19/03/1952 |
Castle |
7022 |
HEREFORD CASTLE |
23/01/1958 |
Castle |
5026 |
CRICCIETH CASTLE |
21/10/1959 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
29/03/1962 |
|