Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2974 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16380 Week
» 69396 Month
» 188923 Year
» 3215776 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Tender #2607
Type |
Collett 4,000g |
Company |
GWR |
Water |
4,000gal |
Coal |
6t 0cwt |
Weight Laden |
46t 14cwt |
|
Tender History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
4095 |
HARLECH CASTLE |
07/05/1935 |
Castle |
5022 |
WIGMORE CASTLE |
27/11/1937 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
17/08/1939 |
Castle |
5066 |
WARDOUR CASTLE |
26/09/1945 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
04/03/1946 |
|