109
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
50415 | 09/08/1957 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 09/08/1957 | |
50416 | 29/10/1957 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 29/10/1957 | |
50417 | 29/11/1957 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 29/11/1957 | |
50418 | 16/04/1958 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 16/04/1958 | |
50419 | 25/08/1958 | 30A | Stratford (New) | 25/08/1958 |