LMS Fowler "4F" Class 0-6-0
LMS | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3835 | 43835 | 10/1911 | 01/10/1955 | 44 | 44.05 | |||||
3836 | 43836 | 11/1911 | 11/07/1959 | 47.67 | 47.70 | |||||
3837 | 43837 | 05/1917 | 11/10/1957 | 40.42 | 40.45 | |||||
3838 | 43838 | 1917 | 14/07/1956 | 39.58 | ||||||
3839 | 43839 | 1917 | 05/03/1960 | 43.25 | ||||||
3840 | 43840 | 1917 | 27/08/1960 | 43.67 | ||||||
3841 | 43841 | 1917 | 28/11/1959 | 42.92 | ||||||
3842 | 43842 | 1917 | 28/11/1959 | 42.92 | ||||||
3843 | 43843 | 1917 | 21/05/1960 | 43.42 | ||||||
3844 | 43844 | 1917 | 24/05/1962 | 45.42 | ||||||
3845 | 43845 | 1917 | 20/07/1963 | 46.58 | ||||||
3846 | 43846 | 1917 | 24/06/1961 | 44.5 | ||||||
3847 | 43847 | 1917 | 25/05/1957 | 40.42 | ||||||
3848 | 43848 | 1917 | 11/06/1962 | 45.5 | ||||||
3849 | 43849 | 1917 | 12/03/1962 | 45.25 | ||||||
3850 | 43850 | 1917 | 02/01/1965 | 48.08 | ||||||
3851 | 43851 | 1917 | 17/08/1957 | 40.67 | ||||||
3852 | 43852 | 1918 | 04/05/1957 | 39.42 | ||||||
3853 | 43853 | 1918 | 14/06/1963 | 45.5 | ||||||
3854 | 43854 | 1918 | 06/06/1964 | 46.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1964 | |||
3855 | 43855 | 1918 | 09/02/1963 | 45.17 | ||||||
3856 | 43856 | 1918 | 26/09/1964 | 46.75 | Cut | Cohens (Ickles) | 04/1965 | |||
3857 | 43857 | 1918 | 30/03/1957 | 39.25 | ||||||
3858 | 43858 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | 42 | ||||||
3859 | 43859 | 1918 | 03/03/1962 | 44.25 | ||||||
3860 | 43860 | 1918 | 26/09/1959 | 41.75 | ||||||
3861 | 43861 | 1918 | 18/05/1963 | 45.42 | ||||||
3862 | 43862 | 1918 | 08/05/1954 | 36.42 | ||||||
3863 | 43863 | 1918 | 02/09/1961 | 43.75 | ||||||
3864 | 43864 | 1918 | 28/11/1959 | 41.92 | ||||||
3865 | 43865 | 1918 | 15/05/1965 | 47.42 | ||||||
3866 | 43866 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | 42 | ||||||
3867 | 43867 | 1918 | 08/10/1955 | 37.83 | ||||||
3868 | 43868 | 1918 | 26/11/1960 | 42.92 | ||||||
3869 | 43869 | 1918 | 21/06/1962 | 44.5 | ||||||
3870 | 43870 | 1918 | 02/11/1963 | 45.92 | ||||||
3871 | 43871 | 1918 | 20/11/1964 | 46.92 | ||||||
3872 | 43872 | 1918 | 26/08/1961 | 43.67 | ||||||
3873 | 43873 | 1918 | 13/06/1959 | 41.5 | ||||||
3874 | 43874 | 1918 | 17/03/1956 | 38.25 | ||||||
3875 | 43875 | 1918 | 05/05/1956 | 38.42 | ||||||
3876 | 43876 | 1918 | 08/12/1962 | 45 | ||||||
3877 | 43877 | 1918 | 03/10/1959 | 41.83 | ||||||
3878 | 43878 | 1918 | 05/12/1959 | 42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1960 | |||
3879 | 43879 | 12/1918 | 12/04/1958 | 39.33 | 39.44 | |||||
3880 | 43880 | 1919 | 02/05/1964 | 45.42 | ||||||
3881 | 43881 | 1919 | 05/12/1959 | 41 | ||||||
3882 | 43882 | 1919 | 29/06/1963 | 44.5 | ||||||
3883 | 43883 | 1919 | 27/09/1961 | 42.75 | ||||||
3884 | 43884 | 1919 | 21/12/1961 | 43 | ||||||
3885 | 43885 | 1919 | 15/02/1964 | 45.17 | ||||||
3886 | 43886 | 1919 | 10/10/1959 | 40.83 | ||||||
3887 | 43887 | 1919 | 06/02/1965 | 46.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | |||
3888 | 43888 | 1919 | 26/09/1964 | 45.75 | Cut | Cohens (Ickles) | 03/1965 | |||
3889 | 43889 | 1919 | 23/03/1957 | 38.25 | ||||||
3890 | 43890 | 1919 | 21/02/1959 | 40.17 | ||||||
3891 | 43891 | 1919 | 05/01/1957 | 38.08 | ||||||
3892 | 43892 | 1919 | 08/02/1959 | 40.17 | ||||||
3893 | 43893 | 1919 | 22/05/1965 | 46.42 | ||||||
3894 | 43894 | 1919 | 03/09/1955 | 36.75 | ||||||
3895 | 43895 | 1919 | 23/06/1956 | 37.5 | ||||||
3896 | 43896 | 1919 | 28/11/1959 | 40.92 | ||||||
3897 | 43897 | 1919 | 09/01/1960 | 41.08 | ||||||
3898 | 43898 | 1919 | 13/07/1957 | 38.58 | ||||||
3899 | 43899 | 1919 | 01/10/1962 | 43.83 | ||||||
3900 | 43900 | 1919 | 01/07/1961 | 42.58 | ||||||
3901 | 43901 | 1919 | 07/09/1957 | 38.75 | ||||||
3902 | 43902 | 1920 | 02/06/1962 | 42.5 | ||||||
3903 | 43903 | 1920 | 09/05/1964 | 44.42 | ||||||
3904 | 43904 | 1920 | 27/06/1959 | 39.5 | ||||||
3905 | 43905 | 1920 | 22/07/1961 | 41.58 | ||||||
3906 | 43906 | 1920 | 11/10/1965 | 45.83 | ||||||
3907 | 43907 | 1920 | 19/12/1959 | 40 | ||||||
3908 | 43908 | 1920 | 14/11/1964 | 44.92 | ||||||
3909 | 43909 | 1920 | 06/08/1955 | 35.67 | ||||||
3910 | 43910 | 1920 | 05/12/1959 | 40 | ||||||
3911 | 43911 | 1920 | 27/05/1961 | 41.42 | ||||||
3912 | 43912 | 1920 | 16/02/1957 | 37.17 | ||||||
3913 | 43913 | 1920 | 03/04/1965 | 45.33 | ||||||
3914 | 43914 | 1920 | 08/09/1962 | 42.75 | ||||||
3915 | 43915 | 1920 | 16/02/1963 | 43.17 | ||||||
3916 | 43916 | 1920 | 23/11/1957 | 37.92 | ||||||
3917 | 43917 | 1920 | 25/07/1964 | 44.58 | ||||||
3918 | 43918 | 1920 | 27/02/1965 | 45.17 | ||||||
3919 | 43919 | 1920 | 05/11/1959 | 39.92 | ||||||
3920 | 43920 | 1920 | 22/07/1961 | 41.58 | ||||||
3921 | 43921 | 1920 | 03/06/1961 | 41.5 | ||||||
3922 | 43922 | 1920 | 15/07/1961 | 41.58 | ||||||
3923 | 43923 | 1920 | 08/02/1964 | 44.17 | ||||||
3924 | 43924 | 10/1920 | 16/06/1965 | 44.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
3925 | 43925 | 1920 | 13/06/1964 | 44.5 | ||||||
3926 | 43926 | 1920 | 06/07/1959 | 39.58 | ||||||
3927 | 43927 | 1920 | 26/10/1957 | 37.83 | ||||||
3928 | 43928 | 1920 | 19/09/1964 | 44.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1964 | |||
3929 | 43929 | 1920 | 14/11/1964 | 44.92 | ||||||
3930 | 43930 | 1920 | 05/12/1959 | 40 | ||||||
3931 | 43931 | 1920 | 17/08/1964 | 44.67 | ||||||
3932 | 43932 | 1920 | 01/09/1962 | 42.75 | ||||||
3933 | 43933 | 1920 | 17/11/1962 | 42.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1963 | |||
3934 | 43934 | 12/1920 | 21/11/1959 | 38.92 | 39.11 | |||||
3935 | 43935 | 01/1921 | 02/11/1963 | 42.83 | 43.78 | |||||
3936 | 43936 | 01/1921 | 04/02/1956 | 35.08 | 35.12 | |||||
3937 | 43937 | 1921 | 20/07/1963 | 42.58 | ||||||
3938 | 43938 | 1921 | 07/04/1962 | 41.33 | ||||||
3939 | 43939 | 1921 | 13/06/1959 | 38.5 | ||||||
3940 | 43940 | 1921 | 24/10/1964 | 43.83 | ||||||
3941 | 43941 | 1921 | 07/09/1957 | 36.75 | ||||||
3942 | 43942 | 1921 | 28/12/1963 | 43 | ||||||
3943 | 43943 | 1921 | 29/09/1956 | 35.75 | ||||||
3944 | 43944 | 1921 | 15/04/1961 | 40.33 | ||||||
3945 | 43945 | 1921 | 06/04/1963 | 42.33 | ||||||
3946 | 43946 | 1921 | 07/02/1959 | 38.17 | ||||||
3947 | 43947 | 1921 | 24/10/1964 | 43.83 | ||||||
3948 | 43948 | 1921 | 08/04/1961 | 40.33 | ||||||
3949 | 43949 | 1921 | 26/12/1964 | 44 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1965 | |||
3950 | 43950 | 1921 | 16/01/1965 | 44.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 05/1965 | |||
3951 | 43951 | 1921 | 19/09/1964 | 43.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1964 | |||
3952 | 43952 | 1921 | 20/03/1965 | 44.25 | ||||||
3953 | 43953 | 1921 | 06/11/1965 | 44.92 | ||||||
3954 | 43954 | 1921 | 21/11/1964 | 43.92 | ||||||
3955 | 43955 | 1921 | 04/01/1964 | 43.08 | ||||||
3956 | 43956 | 1921 | 12/05/1956 | 35.42 | ||||||
3957 | 43957 | 1921 | 02/05/1964 | 43.42 | ||||||
3958 | 43958 | 1921 | 05/09/1964 | 43.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1965 | |||
3959 | 43959 | 1921 | 05/01/1957 | 36.08 | ||||||
3960 | 43960 | 1921 | 14/11/1964 | 43.92 | ||||||
3961 | 43961 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | 39 | ||||||
3962 | 43962 | 1921 | 20/05/1961 | 40.42 | ||||||
3963 | 43963 | 1921 | 21/11/1964 | 43.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) | 03/1965 | |||
3964 | 43964 | 1921 | 11/09/1965 | 44.75 | ||||||
3965 | 43965 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | 39 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1960 | |||
3966 | 43966 | 12/1921 | 05/12/1959 | 38 | 39.03 | |||||
3967 | 43967 | 01/1922 | 28/08/1965 | 43.58 | 43.95 | |||||
3968 | 43968 | 1922 | 11/10/1965 | 43.83 | ||||||
3969 | 43969 | 1922 | 14/09/1963 | 41.75 | ||||||
3970 | 43970 | 1922 | 14/02/1959 | 37.17 | ||||||
3971 | 43971 | 1922 | 28/03/1964 | 42.25 | ||||||
3972 | 43972 | 1922 | 14/03/1964 | 42.25 | ||||||
3973 | 43973 | 1922 | 09/07/1960 | 38.58 | ||||||
3974 | 43974 | 1922 | 14/07/1956 | 34.58 | ||||||
3975 | 43975 | 1922 | 16/01/1965 | 43.08 | ||||||
3976 | 43976 | 1922 | 11/04/1964 | 42.33 | ||||||
3977 | 43977 | 1922 | 09/11/1963 | 41.92 | ||||||
3978 | 43978 | 1922 | 18/01/1958 | 36.08 | ||||||
3979 | 43979 | 1922 | 14/11/1964 | 42.92 | ||||||
3980 | 43980 | 1922 | 06/07/1957 | 35.58 | ||||||
3981 | 43981 | 1922 | 07/08/1965 | 43.67 | ||||||
3982 | 43982 | 1922 | 26/06/1965 | 43.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1965 | |||
3983 | 43983 | 1922 | 09/08/1965 | 43.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1965 | |||
3984 | 43984 | 1922 | 17/01/1959 | 37.08 | ||||||
3985 | 43985 | 1922 | 31/03/1962 | 40.25 | ||||||
3986 | 43986 | 1922 | 22/02/1964 | 42.17 | ||||||
3987 | 43987 | 1921 | 13/07/1963 | 42.58 | ||||||
3988 | 43988 | 1921 | 10/10/1964 | 43.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1964 | |||
3989 | 43989 | 1921 | 23/04/1960 | 39.33 | ||||||
3990 | 43990 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | 39 | ||||||
3991 | 43991 | 1921 | 15/05/1965 | 44.42 | ||||||
3992 | 43992 | 1921 | 09/02/1957 | 36.17 | ||||||
3993 | 43993 | 1921 | 13/07/1957 | 36.58 | ||||||
3994 | 43994 | 1921 | 27/03/1965 | 44.25 | ||||||
3995 | 43995 | 1921 | 15/06/1963 | 42.5 | ||||||
3996 | 43996 | 1921 | 12/03/1962 | 41.25 | ||||||
3997 | 43997 | 1921 | 05/11/1959 | 38.92 | ||||||
3998 | 43998 | 1921 | 14/11/1959 | 38.92 | ||||||
3999 | 43999 | 1921 | 22/05/1965 | 44.42 | ||||||
4000 | 44000 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | 39 | ||||||
4001 | 44001 | 1921 | 26/03/1962 | 41.25 | ||||||
4002 | 44002 | 1921 | 09/1961 | 40.75 | ||||||
4003 | 44003 | 1921 | 03/05/1965 | 44.42 | ||||||
4004 | 44004 | 1921 | 22/12/1962 | 42 | ||||||
4005 | 44005 | 1921 | 05/12/1959 | 39 | ||||||
4006 | 44006 | 1921 | 29/10/1955 | 34.83 | ||||||
4007 | 44007 | 1921 | 11/07/1964 | 43.58 | ||||||
4008 | 44008 | 1921 | 09/1962 | 41.75 | ||||||
4009 | 44009 | 1921 | 27/06/1964 | 43.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 12/1964 | |||
4010 | 44010 | 1921 | 10/1963 | 42.83 | ||||||
4011 | 44011 | 1921 | 01/10/1962 | 41.83 | ||||||
4012 | 44012 | 1921 | 09/11/1963 | 42.92 | ||||||
4013 | 44013 | 12/1921 | 05/10/1963 | 41.83 | 41.86 | |||||
4014 | 44014 | 01/1922 | 05/12/1959 | 37.92 | 39.52 | |||||
4015 | 44015 | 1922 | 09/1963 | 41.75 | ||||||
4016 | 44016 | 1922 | 21/07/1962 | 40.58 | ||||||
4017 | 44017 | 1922 | 10/08/1957 | 35.67 | ||||||
4018 | 44018 | 1922 | 05/12/1959 | 38 | ||||||
4019 | 44019 | 1922 | 17/06/1960 | 38.5 | ||||||
4020 | 44020 | 1922 | 01/09/1962 | 40.75 | ||||||
4021 | 44021 | 1922 | 05/12/1959 | 38 | ||||||
4022 | 44022 | 1922 | 30/11/1963 | 41.92 | ||||||
4023 | 44023 | 1922 | 05/12/1964 | 43 | ||||||
4024 | 44024 | 1922 | 19/01/1957 | 35.08 | ||||||
4025 | 44025 | 1922 | 07/11/1964 | 42.92 | ||||||
4026 | 44026 | 1922 | 06/07/1963 | 41.58 |