Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 874 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 5220 Week
» 5220 Month
» 72082 Year
» 1737458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Collett "1400" Class 0-4-2T


Class GWR (1st) GWR (2nd) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
1400 4800 1400 08/1932 W Withdrawn 06/1957 03/06/1957
1400 4801 1401 08/1932 BAN
84F
S
82D
82D
S
85B
85B
W
Banbury
Stourbridge Junction
Stored
Westbury (Re-instd)
Westbury
Stored
Gloucester Horton Road (Re-instd)
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
26/03/1949
29/12/1951
01/01/1952
12/06/1952
14/06/1952
20/08/1952
06/09/1952
04/10/1952
11/1958
17/11/1958
1400 4802 1402 08/1932 81C
82A
W
Southall
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
29/01/1955
21/05/1955
10/1956
22/10/1956
1400 4803 1403 09/1932 162
SDN
82F
82F
82C
82C
82F
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
26/03/1949
16/06/1951
30/06/1951
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
04/10/1952
11/1957
05/11/1957
1400 4804 1404 09/1932 LYD
HFD
LYD
W
Lydney
Hereford
Lydney
Withdrawn
30/04/1948
16/07/1949
10/09/1949
02/1956
27/02/1956
1400 4805 1405 09/1932 W Withdrawn 09/1958 22/09/1958
1400 4806 1406 09/1932 LYD
GLO
85B
85B
85B
85B
85B
85B
85B
85B
81C
W
Lydney
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Southall
Withdrawn
13/08/1949
08/10/1949
19/04/1952
17/05/1952
14/06/1952
30/06/1952
09/08/1952
31/08/1952
04/10/1952
01/11/1952
23/02/1957
03/1958
03/1958
1400 4807 1407 09/1932 81C
W
Southall
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4808 1408 09/1932 83D
W
Laira
Withdrawn
21/05/1955
03/1958
03/1958
1400 4809 1409 10/1932 175
GLO
LYD
85B
85B
85B
85B
85B
83C
85B
82A
85B
85C
W
Lydney
Gloucester Horton Road
Lydney
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Exeter
Gloucester Horton Road
Bristol Bath Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
08/10/1949
03/12/1949
19/05/1951
29/12/1951
31/01/1952
23/02/1952
31/03/1952
16/05/1953
11/07/1953
20/04/1957
11/07/1959
04/05/1963
10/1963
14/10/1963
1400 4810 1410 17/03/1933 84A
84F
84F
84A
84A
84J
84J
81C
82C
82F
82C
W
Stafford Road
Stourbridge Junction
Stourbridge Junction
Stafford Road
Stafford Road
Croes Newydd
Croes Newydd
Southall
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Withdrawn
15/07/1950
17/10/1950
31/10/1950
31/12/1950
31/01/1951
14/07/1951
31/07/1951
27/03/1954
13/08/1955
15/06/1957
13/07/1957
06/1961
05/06/1961
1400 4811 1411 21/03/1933 BAN
34E
81B
W
Banbury
Neasden
Slough
Withdrawn
26/03/1949
21/10/1950
17/07/1954
10/1956
01/10/1956
1400 4812 1412 24/01/1933 82A
W
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
03/11/1956
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4813 1413 07/04/1933 W Withdrawn 03/1956 14/03/1956
1400 4814 1414 07/04/1933 SRD
STB
W
Stafford Road
Stourbridge Junction
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
20/04/1946
04/1957
08/04/1957
1400 4815 1415 11/04/1933 22
BRD
81C
W
Bristol Bath Road
Bristol Bath Road
Southall
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
23/03/1946
21/05/1955
02/1957
11/02/1957
1400 4816 1416 20/04/1933 W Withdrawn 10/1956 22/10/1956
1400 4817 1417 21/04/1933 OSY
BHD
85D
W
Oswestry
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Kidderminster
Withdrawn
18/05/1946
10/07/1948
29/11/1958
02/1959
16/02/1959
1400 4818 1418 26/04/1933 82F
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Withdrawn
13/07/1957
10/1958
10/1958
1400 4819 1419 26/04/1933 77
LDR
SBZ
W
Fishguard Goodwick
Landore
St Blazey
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
26/01/1946
31/12/1949
04/1961
27/04/1961
1400 4820 1420 02/11/1933 NPT
CHYS
81F
81C
83D
86C
85B
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Cardiff Cathays
Oxford
Southall
Laira
Hereford
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
26/01/1946
20/04/1946
18/05/1946
05/09/1953
04/10/1958
08/08/1959
24/02/1962
12/10/1964
11/1964
06/11/1964
1400 4821 1421 07/11/1933 LTS
NPT
LTS
86A
87J
86A
83D
81D
83C
85C
W
Llantrisant
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Llantrisant
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Fishguard Goodwick
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Laira
Reading (W.R.)
Exeter
Gloucester Barnwood
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
20/04/1946
31/12/1949
29/11/1952
08/10/1955
05/11/1955
14/06/1958
16/07/1960
03/11/1962
02/11/1963
12/1963
28/12/1963
1400 4822 1422 07/11/1933 126
86A
82C
W
Pontypool Road
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Swindon
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
05/11/1955
06/10/1956
06/1957
13/06/1957
1400 4823 1423 08/11/1933 89A
W
Oswestry
Withdrawn
05/10/1957
01/1959
19/01/1959
1400 4824 1424 10/11/1933 LYD
GLO
W
Lydney
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
03/12/1949
12/1963
02/12/1963
1400 4825 1425 15/11/1933 AYN
CHYS
81F
W
Abercynon
Cardiff Cathays
Oxford
Withdrawn
08/10/1949
03/12/1949
05/09/1953
02/1956
27/02/1956
1400 4826 1426 17/11/1933 OXF
91W
84A
84A
84J
84J
81C
81C
85B
82C
82A
85B
85C
85B
W
Oxford
To Western Region / GWR
Stafford Road
Stafford Road
Croes Newydd
Croes Newydd
Southall
Southall
Gloucester Horton Road
Swindon
Bristol Bath Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
30/09/1950
14/07/1951
31/07/1951
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
01/12/1951
31/12/1951
04/10/1958
21/05/1960
13/08/1960
10/09/1960
22/04/1961
04/11/1961
04/1962
03/04/1962
1400 4827 1427 17/11/1933 85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
29/11/1958
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4828 1428 20/11/1933 87E
87J
87E
85B
W
Landore
Fishguard Goodwick
Landore
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
10/07/1948
16/05/1953
08/10/1955
03/12/1955
21/04/1956
06/1959
01/06/1959
1400 4829 1429 24/11/1933 W Withdrawn 03/1959 16/03/1959
1400 4830 1430 10/07/1934 86A
85B
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
06/11/1954
03/12/1955
09/1958
09/1958
1400 4831 1431 13/07/1934 81C
85B
W
Southall
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
19/04/1958
30/01/1960
04/1961
27/04/1961
1400 4832 1432 26/07/1934 W Withdrawn 07/1963 23/07/1963
1400 4833 1433 26/07/1934 WEY
SDN
82A
82C
85B
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Bristol Bath Road
Swindon
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
13/08/1949
08/10/1949
26/01/1957
23/02/1957
27/02/1960
01/1961
17/01/1961
1400 4834 1434 27/07/1934 89C
83D
W
Machynlleth
Laira
Withdrawn
26/03/1955
21/05/1955
07/1962
04/07/1962
1400 4835 1435 16/08/1934 81F
W
Oxford
Withdrawn
14/06/1958
01/1962
05/01/1962
1400 4836 1436 16/08/1934 WEY
SDN
81C
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Swindon
Southall
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
03/12/1949
05/11/1955
10/1958
10/1958
1400 4837 1437 16/08/1934 W Withdrawn 02/1959 16/02/1959
1400 4838 1438 17/08/1934 81C
82C
89A
W
Southall
Swindon
Oswestry
Withdrawn
30/11/1957
04/10/1958
30/01/1960
09/11/1962
09/11/1962
1400 4839 1439 17/08/1934 83C
83A
W
Exeter
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
16/07/1955
08/10/1955
08/1957
19/08/1957
1400 4840 1440 29/03/1935 85B
89D
84C
85B
84C
85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Oswestry
Banbury
Gloucester Horton Road
Banbury
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
20/05/1961
15/07/1961
02/12/1961
21/04/1962
19/05/1962
06/04/1963
12/1963
28/12/1963
1400 4841 1441 03/04/1935 GLO
GLO
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
31/03/1948
31/05/1948
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4842 1442 05/04/1935 81F
81F
81D
81F
82D
83C
83E
83B
W
83E
83D
Oxford
Oxford
Reading (W.R.)
Oxford
Westbury
Exeter
Yeovil Town
Taunton
Withdrawn
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
28/02/1951
31/03/1951
03/10/1953
26/12/1953
03/11/1962
17/11/1962
02/11/1963
28/12/1963
05/1964
12/10/1964
21/02/1965
07/05/1965
1400 4843 1443 08/04/1935 RDG
SHL
S
W
Reading (W.R.)
Southall
Stored
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
26/02/1949
09/10/1955
06/1957
27/06/1957
1400 4844 1444 15/04/1935 81F
81B
81F
85B
W
Oxford
Slough
Oxford
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
03/10/1959
26/03/1960
18/06/1960
28/12/1963
10/1964
19/10/1964
1400 4845 1445 16/04/1935 84C
81B
85C
85B
W
Banbury
Slough
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
09/09/1961
07/10/1961
28/12/1963
04/05/1964
09/1964
01/09/1964
1400 4846 1446 18/04/1935 81C
W
Southall
Withdrawn
16/07/1955
09/1958
09/1958
1400 4847 1447 24/04/1935 81F
89A
81B
88B
89B
86C
W
Oxford
Oswestry
Slough
Radyr
Croes Newydd
Hereford
Withdrawn
21/03/1959
16/05/1959
05/09/1959
20/05/1961
04/11/1961
24/02/1962
03/1964
17/03/1964
1400 4848 1448 25/04/1935 81B
81B
W
Slough
Slough
Withdrawn
04/11/1950
30/11/1950
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4849 1449 26/04/1935 NA
89C
W
Newton Abbot
Machynlleth
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
04/10/1958
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4850 1450 04/07/1935 81B
81F
83C
83B
83E
83D
W
Slough
Oxford
Exeter
Taunton
Yeovil Town
Exmouth Junction
Withdrawn
30/04/1951
05/09/1959
14/07/1962
02/11/1963
12/10/1964
21/02/1965
05/1965
07/05/1965
1400 4851 1451 06/07/1935 83E
85B
W
Yeovil Town
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
28/09/1963
30/11/1963
07/1964
06/07/1964
1400 4852 1452 12/07/1935 83A
83C
W
Newton Abbot
Exeter
Withdrawn
07/09/1957
08/08/1959
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4853 1453 23/07/1935 SDN
WEY
81B
81B
84C
85B
W
Swindon
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Slough
Slough
Banbury
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
26/01/1946
26/03/1949
05/04/1960
23/04/1960
02/12/1961
11/08/1962
11/1964
06/11/1964
1400 4854 1454 24/07/1935 82A
82F
82A
85B
W
Bristol Bath Road
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Bristol Bath Road
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
24/01/1953
17/07/1954
14/08/1954
08/08/1959
12/1960
23/12/1960
1400 4855 1455 26/07/1935 84C
85B
W
Banbury
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
07/10/1961
04/05/1963
05/1964
06/05/1964
1400 4856 1456 27/07/1935 215
LYD
82D
82D
87J
85C
W
Worcester
Lydney
Westbury
Westbury
Fishguard Goodwick
Hereford
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
29/12/1945
14/06/1952
30/06/1952
29/11/1952
03/12/1955
02/1959
16/02/1959
1400 4857 1457 02/08/1935 6C
85D
W
Birkenhead Mollington Street
Kidderminster
Withdrawn
18/04/1953
29/11/1958
02/1959
16/02/1959
1400 4858 1458 07/08/1935 84F
84F
81C
84J
89A
86C
85B
W
Stourbridge Junction
Stourbridge Junction
Southall
Croes Newydd
Oswestry
Hereford
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
25/01/1958
04/10/1958
27/12/1958
30/11/1963
20/07/1964
11/1964
06/11/1964
1400 4859 1459 09/08/1935 84F
82F
W
Stourbridge Junction
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Withdrawn
18/05/1957
30/11/1957
09/1958
09/1958
1400 4860 1460 08/02/1936 W Withdrawn 02/1956 27/02/1956
1400 4861 1461 11/02/1936 CHYS
AYN
CHYS
88A
88A
85A
85B
W
Cardiff Cathays
Abercynon
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Cardiff Cathays
Worcester
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
24/01/1948
31/03/1948
04/09/1948
22/03/1952
30/04/1952
05/09/1953
05/10/1957
05/1958
05/1958
1400 4862 1462 12/02/1936 81F
81C
82C
83C
W
Oxford
Southall
Swindon
Exeter
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
29/11/1952
05/11/1955
21/03/1959
09/1962
01/09/1962
1400 4863 1463 15/02/1936 W Withdrawn 04/1961 27/04/1961
1400 4864 1464 17/02/1936 82C
W
Swindon
Withdrawn
09/08/1958
06/1960
30/06/1960
1400 4865 1465 21/02/1936 81B
84J
84F
84J
W
Slough
Croes Newydd
Stourbridge Junction
Croes Newydd
Withdrawn
03/11/1956
01/12/1956
26/01/1957
20/04/1957
09/1958
09/1958
1400 4866 1466 21/02/1936 133
83C
83B
W
Newton Abbot
Exeter
Taunton
Withdrawn
03/11/1945
22/04/1961
02/11/1963
12/1963
28/12/1963
1400 4867 1467 25/02/1936 85B
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
21/03/1959
04/1959
07/04/1959
1400 4868 1468 26/02/1936 83E
83C
81F
W
St Blazey
Exeter
Oxford
Withdrawn
31/12/1960
12/08/1961
27/01/1962
03/1962
15/03/1962
1400 4869 1469 28/02/1936 W Withdrawn 09/1958 09/1958
1400 4870 1470 16/04/1936 83C
W
Exeter
Withdrawn
20/05/1961
01/10/1962
01/10/1962
1400 4871 1471 17/04/1936 86A
83C
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Exeter
Withdrawn
12/06/1958
04/10/1958
10/1963
15/10/1963
1400 4872 1472 20/04/1936 83A
71G
85B
W
Newton Abbot
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
25/02/1956
13/10/1958
21/03/1959
11/1964
06/11/1964
1400 4873 1473 22/04/1936 84J
34E
85B
W
Croes Newydd
Neasden
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
25/03/1950
21/11/1953
28/01/1961
08/1962
10/08/1962
1400 4874 1474 23/04/1936 81C
81C
71G
81D
81D
81C
81B
81C
81B
85C
85B
W
Southall
Southall
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Reading (W.R.)
Reading (W.R.)
Southall
Slough
Southall
Slough
Gloucester Barnwood
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
08/09/1951
30/09/1951
13/10/1958
05/04/1960
23/04/1960
21/05/1960
28/01/1961
17/06/1961
16/06/1962
31/08/1963
04/05/1964
09/1964
28/09/1964