GWR Collett "5800" Class 0-4-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5800 | 5800 | 05/01/1933 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1958 |
22/07/1958 |
5800 | 5801 | 04/01/1933 | BCN 89C W |
Brecon Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1955 09/1958 |
09/09/1958 |
5800 | 5802 | 07/01/1933 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1958 |
29/12/1958 |
5800 | 5803 | 10/01/1933 | BRD 81F 89C S W |
Bristol Bath Road Oxford Machynlleth Stored Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/05/1948 21/03/1953 18/06/1955 08/08/1956 07/1957 |
02/07/1957 |
5800 | 5804 | 12/01/1933 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1959 |
01/06/1959 |
5800 | 5805 | 18/01/1933 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1958 |
24/03/1958 |
5800 | 5806 | 18/01/1933 | SDN OSY S W |
Swindon Oswestry Stored Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 01/12/1945 15/06/1947 14/03/1953 06/1957 |
14/06/1957 |
5800 | 5807 | 23/01/1933 | WOS WOS HFD S W |
Worcester Worcester Hereford Stored Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 01/12/1945 20/04/1946 15/06/1947 04/10/1952 06/1957 |
14/06/1957 |
5800 | 5808 | 25/01/1933 | HFD WOS HFD S 81F W |
Hereford Worcester Hereford Stored Oxford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/09/1948 14/10/1948 12/02/1951 02/03/1953 02/1957 |
04/02/1957 |
5800 | 5809 | 01/02/1933 | BRD 89C W |
Bristol Bath Road Machynlleth Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/09/1956 08/1959 |
10/08/1959 |
5800 | 5810 | 07/08/1933 | CNYD W |
Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1959 |
05/01/1959 |
5800 | 5811 | 09/08/1933 | CNYD S 81F W |
Croes Newydd Stored Oxford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/07/1956 06/02/1957 05/1957 |
27/05/1957 |
5800 | 5812 | 10/08/1933 | exe TN S W |
Tiverton Junction Taunton Stored Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 30/06/1948 21/03/1953 06/1957 |
18/06/1957 |
5800 | 5813 | 14/08/1933 | SALOP BRD BRD S 84D W |
Shrewsbury Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Stored Leamington (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 23/03/1946 15/06/1947 23/04/1956 05/04/1957 11/1957 |
30/11/1957 |
5800 | 5814 | 16/08/1933 | HFD HFD S W |
Hereford Hereford Stored Withdrawn |
03/11/1945 26/01/1946 15/06/1947 02/04/1951 06/1957 |
18/06/1957 |
5800 | 5815 | 18/08/1933 | WOS WOS 84D 84C 82C W |
Worcester Worcester Leamington Banbury Swindon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 20/04/1957 22/02/1958 19/04/1958 04/1961 |
27/04/1961 |
5800 | 5816 | 22/08/1933 | WOS S 81F W |
Worcester Stored Oxford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 15/06/1947 17/11/1956 15/06/1957 07/1957 |
02/07/1957 |
5800 | 5817 | 23/08/1933 | HFD S W |
Hereford Stored Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/10/1952 06/1957 |
18/06/1957 |
5800 | 5818 | 24/08/1933 | PPRD PPRD 85C 85A 81F W |
Pontypool Road Pontypool Road Hereford Worcester Oxford Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 21/02/1953 01/12/1956 13/07/1957 09/1959 |
14/09/1959 |
5800 | 5819 | 29/08/1933 | CARM CARM S W |
Carmarthen Carmarthen Stored Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 15/06/1953 06/1957 |
26/06/1957 |