GWR Collett "2251" Class 0-6-0
GWR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2200 | 27/06/1938 | 17/09/1962 | 24.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1964 | 25.99 | ||
2201 | 28/07/1939 | 15/06/1964 | 24.92 | 25.49 | |||||
2202 | 01/08/1939 | 11/10/1960 | 21.17 | 21.47 | |||||
2203 | 04/08/1939 | 30/06/1960 | 20.83 | 21.30 | |||||
2204 | 08/08/1939 | 28/12/1963 | 24.33 | 24.79 | |||||
2205 | 15/08/1939 | 15/06/1959 | 19.83 | 20.55 | |||||
2206 | 24/08/1939 | 04/12/1961 | 22.33 | 22.74 | |||||
2207 | 29/08/1939 | 12/01/1961 | 21.42 | 21.81 | |||||
2208 | 02/09/1939 | 15/06/1959 | 19.75 | 20.63 | |||||
2209 | 04/09/1939 | 02/08/1962 | 22.92 | 23.88 | |||||
2210 | 09/09/1939 | 05/06/1965 | 25.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1965 | 26.04 | ||
2211 | 17/05/1940 | 14/11/1964 | 24.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 24.60 | ||
2212 | 16/05/1940 | 05/12/1962 | 22.58 | 23.93 | |||||
2213 | 18/05/1940 | 10/11/1960 | 20.5 | 20.76 | |||||
2214 | 26/05/1940 | 07/05/1965 | 25 | 25.24 | |||||
2215 | 29/05/1940 | 19/10/1961 | 21.42 | 21.56 | |||||
2216 | 02/06/1940 | 15/01/1962 | 21.58 | 22.05 | |||||
2217 | 14/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | 24.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 24.85 | ||
2218 | 10/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | 24.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1965 | 24.86 | ||
2219 | 17/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | 23.75 | 24.01 | |||||
2220 | 18/06/1940 | 27/12/1961 | 21.5 | 21.75 | |||||
2221 | 20/08/1940 | 14/11/1964 | 24.25 | 24.58 | |||||
2222 | 23/08/1940 | 21/05/1965 | 24.75 | 24.99 | |||||
2223 | 29/08/1940 | 11/05/1962 | 21.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1962 | 22.31 | ||
2224 | 11/09/1940 | 30/09/1963 | 23 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1964 | 23.36 | ||
2225 | 16/09/1940 | 15/06/1959 | 18.75 | 19.34 | |||||
2226 | 30/09/1940 | 21/08/1959 | 18.92 | 19.10 | |||||
2227 | 07/10/1940 | 12/01/1961 | 20.25 | 20.78 | |||||
2228 | 15/10/1940 | 15/06/1959 | 18.67 | 19.18 | |||||
2229 | 26/10/1940 | 01/09/1962 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 22.90 | ||
2230 | 31/10/1940 | 18/01/1962 | 21.25 | 21.47 | |||||
2231 | 04/10/1944 | 06/02/1965 | 20.33 | 20.38 | |||||
2232 | 11/10/1944 | 21/09/1964 | 19.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1964 | 20.11 | ||
2233 | 19/10/1944 | 03/11/1961 | 17.08 | 17.41 | |||||
2234 | 26/10/1944 | 21/05/1962 | 17.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1962 | 17.98 | ||
2235 | 27/10/1944 | 17/08/1959 | 14.83 | 15.14 | |||||
2236 | 28/10/1944 | 15/05/1965 | 20.58 | 21.32 | |||||
2237 | 07/11/1944 | 15/06/1959 | 14.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1960 | 15.45 | ||
2238 | 15/11/1944 | 15/06/1959 | 14.58 | 15.09 | |||||
2239 | 25/11/1944 | 21/05/1962 | 17.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1963 | 18.24 | ||
2240 | 01/12/1944 | 22/06/1962 | 17.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1962 | 17.97 | ||
2241 | 29/03/1945 | 14/02/1964 | 18.92 | 19.39 | |||||
2242 | 04/04/1945 | 21/05/1965 | 20.08 | 20.38 | |||||
2243 | 11/04/1945 | 14/01/1963 | 17.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1963 | 18.10 | ||
2244 | 19/04/1945 | 21/05/1965 | 20.08 | 20.34 | |||||
2245 | 25/04/1945 | 23/05/1963 | 18.08 | 19.07 | |||||
2246 | 09/08/1945 | Stourbridge Junction | 28/12/1963 | 18.33 | 18.70 | ||||
2247 | 10/08/1945 | Worcester | 26/02/1964 | 18.5 | 18.86 | ||||
2248 | 14/08/1945 | 01/09/1964 | 19.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 19.35 | ||
2249 | 24/08/1945 | Oxford | 01/09/1964 | 19.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 19.32 | |
2250 | 14/09/1945 | 02/08/1962 | 16.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1963 | 18.01 | ||
2251 | 03/1930 | 28/12/1963 | 33.75 | 34.19 | |||||
2252 | 03/1930 | 07/12/1959 | 29.75 | 30.02 | |||||
2253 | 03/1930 | 08/03/1965 | 35 | 35.19 | |||||
2254 | 03/1930 | 19/01/1959 | 28.83 | 29.69 | |||||
2255 | 03/1930 | 08/05/1962 | 32.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 11/1962 | 32.69 | ||
2256 | 03/1930 | 21/09/1962 | 32.5 | 33.86 | |||||
2257 | 04/1930 | 01/09/1964 | 34.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 34.69 | ||
2258 | 04/1930 | 15/12/1958 | 28.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 21/02/1959 | 28.87 | ||
2259 | 04/1930 | 13/04/1959 | 29 | 29.10 | |||||
2260 | 04/1930 | 03/11/1961 | 31.58 | 31.86 | |||||
2261 | 04/1930 | 01/09/1964 | 34.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 34.69 | ||
2262 | 04/1930 | 30/11/1959 | 29.58 | 29.94 | |||||
2263 | 04/1930 | 05/01/1959 | 28.75 | 28.93 | |||||
2264 | 04/1930 | 30/06/1960 | 30.17 | 30.52 | |||||
2265 | 05/1930 | 30/06/1960 | 30.08 | 30.53 | |||||
2266 | 05/1930 | 06/10/1959 | 29.42 | 29.85 | |||||
2267 | 06/1930 | 21/11/1961 | 31.42 | 31.77 | |||||
2268 | 06/1930 | 22/05/1965 | 34.92 | 35.70 | |||||
2269 | 07/1930 | 27/01/1959 | 28.5 | 28.68 | |||||
2270 | 04/1930 | 21/09/1959 | 29.42 | 29.69 | |||||
2271 | 27/08/1934 | 21/09/1962 | 28.08 | 29.15 | |||||
2272 | 28/08/1934 | 17/08/1959 | 25 | 25.40 | |||||
2273 | 29/08/1934 | 02/12/1963 | 29.33 | 29.90 | |||||
2274 | 30/08/1934 | 30/06/1960 | 25.83 | 26.23 | |||||
2275 | 31/08/1934 | 29/02/1960 | 25.5 | 25.72 | |||||
2276 | 12/09/1934 | 17/09/1962 | 28 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1964 | 29.86 | ||
2277 | 12/09/1934 | 28/12/1963 | 29.25 | 29.69 | |||||
2278 | 13/09/1934 | 14/09/1959 | 25 | 25.52 | |||||
2279 | 14/09/1934 | 30/01/1959 | 24.33 | 24.68 | |||||
2280 | 14/09/1934 | 14/09/1959 | 25 | 25.47 | |||||
2281 | 10/01/1936 | 25/11/1959 | 23.83 | 24.95 | |||||
2282 | 13/01/1936 | 30/05/1960 | 24.33 | 24.61 | |||||
2283 | 15/01/1936 | 28/12/1963 | 27.92 | 28.27 | |||||
2284 | 18/01/1936 | 24/06/1959 | 23.42 | 24.13 | |||||
2285 | 18/01/1936 | 02/11/1959 | 23.83 | 24.01 | |||||
2286 | 23/01/1936 | 28/09/1964 | 28.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1965 | 29.00 | ||
2287 | 23/01/1936 | 21/05/1965 | 29.33 | 29.67 | |||||
2288 | 28/01/1936 | 19/12/1961 | 25.92 | 26.40 | |||||
2289 | 28/01/1936 | 23/05/1964 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1964 | 28.57 | ||
2290 | 31/01/1936 | 15/06/1959 | 23.42 | 24.14 | |||||
2291 | 31/01/1938 | 28/09/1964 | 26.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1964 | 26.81 | ||
2292 | 31/01/1938 | 22/06/1962 | 24.42 | 24.64 | |||||
2293 | 02/02/1938 | 20/07/1959 | 21.42 | 21.71 | |||||
2294 | 03/02/1938 | 21/09/1962 | 24.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1964 | 26.55 | ||
2295 | 08/02/1938 | 04/07/1962 | 24.42 | 24.70 | |||||
2296 | 03/06/1938 | 12/10/1959 | 21.33 | 21.63 | |||||
2297 | 15/06/1938 | 30/06/1960 | 22 | 22.35 | |||||
2298 | 22/06/1938 | 28/12/1963 | 25.5 | 25.83 | |||||
2299 | 23/06/1938 | 28/09/1959 | 21.25 | 21.58 | |||||
3200 | 21/09/1946 | 15/01/1965 | 18.33 | 18.58 | |||||
3201 | 30/09/1946 | 21/05/1965 | 18.67 | 18.89 | |||||
3202 | 05/10/1946 | Oswestry | 20/06/1960 | 13.67 | 13.87 | ||||
3203 | 09/10/1946 | Shrewsbury | 28/12/1963 | 17.17 | 17.53 | ||||
3204 | 11/10/1946 | Gloucester Horton Road | 01/03/1963 | 16.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1963 | 17.02 | |
3205 | 18/10/1946 | Gloucester Horton Road | 21/05/1965 | 18.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||
3206 | 21/10/1946 | Croes Newydd | 28/12/1963 | 17.17 | 17.58 | ||||
3207 | 25/10/1946 | Machynlleth | 05/12/1962 | 16.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1964 | 17.73 | |
3208 | 29/10/1946 | Oswestry | 08/05/1965 | 18.58 | 18.81 | ||||
3209 | 08/11/1946 | 13/06/1964 | 17.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1964 | 17.78 | ||
3210 | 03/12/1947 | 13/11/1964 | 16.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1965 | 17.22 | ||
3211 | 04/12/1947 | 01/09/1962 | 14.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1963 | 15.37 | ||
3212 | 09/12/1947 | 21/10/1963 | 15.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 17.03 | ||
3213 | 11/12/1947 | 28/12/1963 | Machynlleth | 16 | 16.36 | ||||
3214 | 15/12/1947 | 25/10/1963 | 15.83 | 16.10 | |||||
3215 | 17/12/1947 | 09/01/1963 | 15.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1964 | 16.09 | ||
3216 | 19/12/1947 | 02/12/1963 | 16 | 16.42 | |||||
3217 | 24/12/1947 | 14/11/1964 | 16.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1964 | 16.99 | ||
3218 | 02/01/1948 | 21/05/1965 | 17.33 | 17.63 | |||||
3219 | 30/01/1948 | 02/12/1963 | 15.92 | 16.22 |