GWR Dean "2361" Class 0-6-0
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2361 | 2361 | 09/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
2361 | 2362 | 10/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1946 | 07/11/1946 |
2361 | 2363 | 11/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 |
2361 | 2364 | 11/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1934 | 04/08/1934 |
2361 | 2365 | 11/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1928 | 10/1928 |
2361 | 2366 | 12/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1933 | 01/02/1933 |
2361 | 2367 | 12/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
2361 | 2368 | 12/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1938 | 03/1938 |
2361 | 2369 | 12/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1937 | 11/1937 |
2361 | 2370 | 12/1885 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 |
2361 | 2371 | 01/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 |
2361 | 2372 | 01/1886 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 02/1938 |
02/1938 |
2361 | 2373 | 02/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 03/11/1934 |
2361 | 2374 | 03/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1930 | 11/1930 |
2361 | 2375 | 03/1886 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 05/1938 |
05/1938 |
2361 | 2376 | 03/1886 | PDN W |
Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 12/1938 |
12/1938 |
2361 | 2377 | 04/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 |
2361 | 2378 | 04/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1945 | 17/03/1945 |
2361 | 2379 | 04/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 |
2361 | 2380 | 05/1886 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1943 | 23/09/1943 |