Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 260 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16567 Week
» 68452 Month
» 693807 Year
» 3720660 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)

BPGVR/GWR "BPGV1" Class 0-6-0T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
16/11/1935 Reallocation 2167     LLY.1 Burry Port  
29/12/1945 Reallocation 2167 LLY.1 Burry Port LLY Llanelli  
26/01/1946 Reallocation 2162     LLY Llanelli  
15/06/1947 Reallocation 2162 LLY Llanelli LLY Llanelli  
15/06/1947 Reallocation 2165     LLY Llanelli  
15/06/1947 Reallocation 2166     SED Swansea East Dock  
15/06/1947 Reallocation 2167 LLY Llanelli LLY Llanelli  
15/06/1947 Reallocation 2168     LLY Llanelli  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 2167 LLY Llanelli LLY Llanelli  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 2168 LLY Llanelli LDR Landore  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 2167 LLY Llanelli LDR Landore  
04/09/1948 Reallocation 2162 LLY Llanelli LDR Landore  
14/10/1948 Reallocation 2162 LDR Landore LLY Llanelli  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 2162 LLY Llanelli 87F Llanelli  
31/12/1951 Reallocation 2162 87F Llanelli 87F Llanelli  
09/02/1953 Condemned 2167 98W     COND  
15/03/1955 Condemned 2162 98W     COND  
16/03/1955 Condemned 2165 98W     COND  
10/05/1955 Condemned 2166 98W     COND  
28/05/1956 Condemned 2168 98W     COND