GWR Hawksworth "9400" Class 0-6-0PT
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mon 09/08/1954 | 8464, 9410 |
88B, 81A |
Barry Works visit: Around the works. - Outside the Works. Barry Works visit: Around the works. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Tue 17/08/1954 | 9421 | ?? | Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 9400 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 8441, 8451, 8489, 8494, 9400, 9416, 9454, 9460, 9474 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Dump. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "C" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Dump. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Dump. |
|||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 8405 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: Yard | RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 8409, 9425, 9457 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Around the turntable Swindon Works visit: Around the turntable Swindon Works visit: Around the turntable |
RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 8401, 8418, 9484 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Dump | RO 1/1965 |