Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 478 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19389 Week
» 84343 Month
» 287007 Year
» 3313860 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "1854" Class 0-6-0PT
GWR |
NaBR (Sold) |
RSBR (Sold) |
GWR (Amalg) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
905
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
15/11/1947 |
|
52.5 |
|
|
|
|
906
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
52.92 |
|
|
|
|
907
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
13/03/1951 |
|
55.83 |
|
|
|
|
1701
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
|
07/1928 |
|
37.42 |
|
|
|
|
1702
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
|
09/1938 |
|
47.5 |
|
|
|
|
1703
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
|
28/07/1945 |
|
54.33 |
|
|
|
|
1704
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
|
01/1935 |
|
43.83 |
|
|
|
|
1705
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
|
03/11/1950 |
|
59.67 |
|
|
|
|
1706
|
|
|
|
03/1891 |
|
28/06/1948 |
|
57.25 |
|
|
|
|
1707
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
|
30/07/1947 |
|
56.25 |
|
|
|
|
1708
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
|
01/1935 |
|
43.75 |
|
|
|
|
1709
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
|
07/11/1950 |
|
59.58 |
|
|
|
|
1710
|
|
36
|
1710
|
04/1891 |
|
02/1937 |
|
45.83 |
|
|
|
|
1711
|
|
|
|
04/1891 |
|
06/1928 |
|
37.17 |
|
|
|
|
1712
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
|
12/01/1946 |
|
54.67 |
|
|
|
|
1713
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
|
07/06/1948 |
|
57.08 |
|
|
|
|
1714
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
55.17 |
|
|
|
|
1715
|
16
|
|
1715
|
05/1891 |
|
04/10/1949 |
|
58.42 |
|
|
|
|
1716
|
|
|
|
05/1891 |
|
31/05/1947 |
|
56 |
|
|
|
|
1717
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
|
12/1936 |
|
45.5 |
|
|
|
|
1718
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
|
10/1936 |
|
45.33 |
|
|
|
|
1719
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
|
14/11/1945 |
|
54.42 |
|
|
|
|
1720
|
|
|
|
06/1891 |
|
12/12/1949 |
|
58.5 |
|
|
|
|
1721
|
|
|
|
05/1892 |
|
26/07/1946 |
|
54.17 |
|
|
|
|
1722
|
|
|
|
05/1892 |
|
07/11/1946 |
|
54.5 |
|
|
|
|
1723
|
|
|
|
05/1892 |
|
01/1935 |
|
42.67 |
|
|
|
|
1724
|
|
|
|
05/1892 |
|
11/1929 |
|
37.5 |
|
|
|
|
1725
|
|
|
|
06/1892 |
|
03/10/1946 |
|
54.33 |
|
|
|
|
1726
|
|
|
|
06/1892 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
55.83 |
|
|
|
|
1727
|
|
|
|
06/1892 |
|
05/1935 |
|
42.92 |
|
|
|
|
1728
|
|
|
|
06/1892 |
|
02/1932 |
|
39.67 |
|
|
|
|
1729
|
|
|
|
07/1892 |
|
09/1942 |
|
50.17 |
|
|
|
|
1730
|
|
|
|
07/1892 |
|
02/08/1948 |
|
56.08 |
|
|
|
|
1731
|
|
|
|
07/1892 |
|
14/06/1949 |
|
56.92 |
|
|
|
|
1732
|
|
|
|
07/1892 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
54 |
|
|
|
|
1733
|
|
|
|
08/1892 |
|
06/1936 |
|
43.83 |
|
|
|
|
1734
|
|
|
|
08/1892 |
|
23/02/1946 |
|
53.5 |
|
|
|
|
1735
|
|
|
|
08/1892 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
53.92 |
|
|
|
|
1736
|
|
|
|
08/1892 |
|
27/04/1945 |
|
52.67 |
|
|
|
|
1737
|
|
|
|
08/1892 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
53.25 |
|
|
|
|
1738
|
|
|
|
09/1892 |
|
02/1939 |
|
46.42 |
|
|
|
|
1739
|
|
|
|
09/1892 |
|
03/1931 |
|
38.5 |
|
|
|
|
1740
|
|
|
|
09/1892 |
|
08/11/1944 |
|
52.17 |
|
|
|
|
1751
|
|
|
|
10/1892 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
53.08 |
|
|
|
|
1752
|
|
|
|
10/1892 |
|
17/03/1950 |
|
57.42 |
|
|
|
|
1753
|
|
|
|
10/1892 |
|
10/04/1948 |
|
55.5 |
|
|
|
|
1754
|
|
|
|
10/1892 |
|
08/12/1949 |
|
57.17 |
|
|
|
|
1755
|
|
|
|
11/1892 |
|
04/1936 |
|
43.42 |
|
|
|
|
1756
|
|
35
|
35
|
11/1892 |
|
31/07/1946 |
|
53.67 |
|
|
|
|
1757
|
|
|
|
11/1892 |
|
03/1931 |
|
38.33 |
|
|
|
|
1758
|
|
|
|
11/1892 |
|
28/03/1949 |
|
56.33 |
|
|
|
|
1759
|
|
|
|
11/1892 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
53 |
|
|
|
|
1760
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
|
27/07/1950 |
|
57.58 |
|
|
|
|
1761
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
|
06/12/1946 |
|
54 |
|
|
|
|
1762
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
55.33 |
|
|
|
|
1763
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
|
04/11/1946 |
|
53.92 |
|
|
|
|
1764
|
|
|
|
12/1892 |
|
04/10/1949 |
|
56.83 |
|
|
|
|
1765
|
|
|
|
01/1893 |
|
11/1938 |
|
45.83 |
|
|
|
|
1766
|
|
|
|
01/1893 |
|
06/1938 |
|
45.42 |
|
|
|
|
1767
|
|
|
|
01/1893 |
|
11/12/1947 |
|
54.92 |
|
|
|
|
1768
|
|
|
|
01/1893 |
|
11/12/1947 |
|
54.92 |
|
|
|
|
1769
|
|
|
|
02/1893 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
55.17 |
|
|
|
|
1770
|
|
|
|
02/1893 |
|
05/1936 |
|
43.25 |
|
|
|
|
1791
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
01/1935 |
|
39.67 |
|
|
|
|
1792
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
50.5 |
|
|
|
|
1793
|
|
|
|
05/1895 |
|
14/11/1945 |
|
50.5 |
|
|
|
|
1794
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
04/12/1946 |
|
51.5 |
|
|
|
|
1795
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
26/06/1947 |
|
52 |
|
|
|
|
1796
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
11/02/1947 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
|
1797
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
31/07/1946 |
|
51.08 |
|
|
|
|
1798
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
51.08 |
|
|
|
|
1799
|
|
|
|
06/1895 |
|
20/12/1949 |
|
54.5 |
|
|
|
|
1800
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
11/12/1947 |
|
52.42 |
|
|
|
|
1854
|
|
|
|
01/1890 |
|
09/12/1944 |
|
54.92 |
|
|
|
|
1855
|
|
|
|
02/1890 |
|
20/12/1950 |
|
60.83 |
|
|
|
|
1856
|
|
|
|
02/1890 |
|
14/11/1945 |
|
55.75 |
|
|
|
|
1857
|
|
|
|
02/1890 |
|
01/1931 |
|
40.92 |
|
|
|
|
1858
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
23/10/1950 |
|
60.58 |
|
|
|
|
1859
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
15/07/1946 |
|
56.33 |
|
|
|
|
1860
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
12/1934 |
|
44.75 |
|
|
|
|
1861
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
06/11/1951 |
|
61.67 |
|
|
|
|
1862
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
04/12/1950 |
|
60.75 |
|
|
|
|
1863
|
|
|
|
03/1890 |
|
28/09/1949 |
|
59.5 |
|
|
|
|
1864
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
08/1935 |
|
45.33 |
|
|
|
|
1865
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
21/11/1933 |
|
43.58 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Caerphilly) |
16/12/1933 |
43.70 |
1866
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
27/11/1946 |
|
56.58 |
|
|
|
|
1867
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
08/11/1948 |
|
58.58 |
|
|
|
|
1868
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
02/1939 |
|
48.83 |
|
|
|
|
1869
|
|
|
|
04/1890 |
|
12/1934 |
|
44.67 |
|
|
|
|
1870
|
|
|
|
05/1890 |
|
20/10/1950 |
|
60.42 |
|
|
|
|
1871
|
|
|
|
05/1890 |
|
09/1928 |
|
38.33 |
|
|
|
|
1872
|
|
|
|
05/1890 |
|
04/1935 |
|
44.92 |
|
|
|
|
1873
|
|
|
|
05/1890 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
55.5 |
|
|
|
|
1874
|
|
|
|
10/1890 |
|
11/1931 |
|
41.08 |
|
|
|
|
1875
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
55 |
|
|
|
|
1876
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
02/1936 |
|
45.25 |
|
|
|
|
1877
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
11/1935 |
|
45 |
|
|
|
|
1878
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
29/11/1949 |
|
59 |
|
|
|
|
1879
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
09/1928 |
|
37.83 |
|
|
|
|
1880
|
|
|
|
11/1890 |
|
04/1935 |
|
44.42 |
|
|
|
|
1881
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
12/1936 |
|
46 |
|
|
|
|
1882
|
13
|
|
1882
|
12/1890 |
|
04/12/1946 |
|
56 |
|
|
|
|
1883
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
11/12/1947 |
|
57 |
|
|
|
|
1884
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
13/08/1949 |
|
58.67 |
|
|
|
|
1885
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
11/1928 |
|
37.92 |
|
|
|
|
1886
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
08/06/1945 |
|
54.5 |
|
|
|
|
1887
|
|
|
|
12/1890 |
|
28/07/1945 |
|
54.58 |
|
|
|
|
1888
|
|
|
|
01/1891 |
|
23/12/1949 |
|
58.92 |
|
|
|
|
1889
|
|
|
|
01/1891 |
|
24/12/1948 |
Cardiff Canton |
57.92 |
|
|
|
|
1890
|
|
|
|
01/1891 |
|
12/06/1947 |
|
56.42 |
|
|
|
|
1891
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
|
20/12/1949 |
|
58.83 |
|
|
|
|
1892
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
|
04/1936 |
|
45.17 |
|
|
|
|
1893
|
|
|
|
02/1891 |
|
30/11/1945 |
|
54.75 |
|
|
|
|
1894
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
15/02/1949 |
|
53.58 |
|
|
|
|
1895
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
22/05/1947 |
|
51.83 |
|
|
|
|
1896
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
15/12/1949 |
|
54.42 |
|
|
|
|
1897
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
03/01/1949 |
|
53.5 |
|
|
|
|
1898
|
|
|
|
07/1895 |
|
27/04/1945 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
1899
|
|
|
|
08/1895 |
|
20/01/1945 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
|
1900
|
|
|
|
08/1895 |
|
24/04/1948 |
|
52.67 |
|
|
|
|