GWR Dean "2721" Class 0-6-0PT
Class | GWR | GWR (Renum) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2721 | 2800 | 2700 | 03/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 |
2721 | 2721 | 11/1897 | DYD W |
Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1950 |
17/08/1950 | |
2721 | 2722 | 03/1898 | NEA W |
Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1950 |
27/11/1950 | |
2721 | 2723 | 03/1898 | SDN W |
Swindon (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1947 |
14/08/1947 | |
2721 | 2724 | 03/1898 | CHYS W |
Cardiff Cathays Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/1949 |
14/02/1949 | |
2721 | 2725 | 03/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1946 | 05/01/1946 | |
2721 | 2726 | 04/1898 | NPT W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1947 |
02/08/1947 | |
2721 | 2727 | 04/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2728 | 05/1898 | PPRD W |
Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2729 | 05/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1946 | 04/03/1946 | |
2721 | 2730 | 05/1898 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2731 | 05/1898 | PILL SDN W |
Newport Pill Swindon (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/07/1947 27/08/1947 10/1947 |
29/10/1947 | |
2721 | 2732 | 06/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 19/10/1945 | |
2721 | 2733 | 06/1898 | TYS W |
Tyseley Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/08/1947 11/1947 |
04/11/1947 | |
2721 | 2734 | 07/1898 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1948 |
02/08/1948 | |
2721 | 2735 | 07/1898 | TDU |
Tondu |
15/06/1947 27/08/1947 |
27/08/1947 | |
2721 | 2736 | 08/1898 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1947 |
02/08/1947 | |
2721 | 2737 | 08/1898 | PZ W |
Penzance Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1947 |
14/11/1947 | |
2721 | 2738 | 08/1898 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
13/12/1949 | |
2721 | 2739 | 09/1898 | PPRD W |
Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1948 |
10/05/1948 | |
2721 | 2740 | 09/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2741 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 19/10/1945 | |
2721 | 2742 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 24/10/1945 | |
2721 | 2743 | 04/1899 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1950 |
02/10/1950 | |
2721 | 2744 | 04/1899 | SALOP W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1950 |
08/11/1950 | |
2721 | 2745 | 05/1899 | BHD SALOP CNYD W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Shrewsbury Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 27/11/1948 01/1950 |
30/01/1950 | |
2721 | 2746 | 05/1899 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1948 |
10/07/1948 | |
2721 | 2747 | 05/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2748 | 05/1899 | TN W |
Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2749 | 05/1899 | PPRD W |
Pontypool Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2750 | 06/1899 | THT MTHR W |
Treherbert Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 11/01/1936 11/1945 |
03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2751 | 06/1899 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2752 | 06/1899 | PZ W |
Penzance Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1948 |
01/03/1948 | |
2721 | 2753 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2754 | 07/1899 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1950 |
02/10/1950 | |
2721 | 2755 | 07/1899 | TN W |
Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1948 |
16/08/1948 | |
2721 | 2756 | 08/1899 | GLO W |
Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1949 |
17/05/1949 | |
2721 | 2757 | 08/1899 | GLO SLO SHL W |
Gloucester Horton Road Slough Southall Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 21/02/1948 02/1950 |
03/02/1950 | |
2721 | 2758 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1945 | 15/12/1945 | |
2721 | 2759 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1945 | 19/10/1945 | |
2721 | 2760 | 08/1899 | MTHR W |
Merthyr Tydfil Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1950 |
23/10/1950 | |
2721 | 2761 | 03/1900 | TDU W |
Tondu Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1950 |
10/03/1950 | |
2721 | 2762 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1946 | 15/07/1946 | |
2721 | 2763 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2764 | 03/1900 | PILL PILL W |
Newport Pill Newport Pill Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 07/1948 |
10/07/1948 | |
2721 | 2765 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 30/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2766 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 14/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2767 | 08/1900 | TDU W |
Tondu Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
10/01/1949 | |
2721 | 2768 | 09/1900 | SBZ W |
St Blazey Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1947 |
23/10/1947 | |
2721 | 2769 | 09/1900 | NPT TDU W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Tondu Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 03/1949 |
14/03/1949 | |
2721 | 2770 | 09/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2771 | 09/1900 | STB W |
Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1950 |
12/06/1950 | |
2721 | 2772 | 09/1900 | LMTN W |
Leamington Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
24/11/1949 | |
2721 | 2773 | 09/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1946 | 03/10/1946 | |
2721 | 2774 | 09/1900 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2775 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1946 | 31/07/1946 | |
2721 | 2776 | 10/1900 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
10/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2777 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | |
2721 | 2778 | 10/1900 | CHR W |
Chester West Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1947 |
07/07/1947 | |
2721 | 2779 | 10/1900 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 11/1945 |
03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2780 | 10/1900 | YEO WES SBZ W |
Yeovil Pen Mill Westbury St Blazey Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 14/12/1935 15/06/1947 07/1950 |
10/07/1950 | |
2721 | 2781 | 01/1901 | CED W |
Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1948 |
07/06/1948 | |
2721 | 2782 | 01/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1946 | 06/02/1946 | |
2721 | 2783 | 01/1901 | DID W |
Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1947 |
15/11/1947 | |
2721 | 2784 | 01/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 07/05/1947 | |
2721 | 2785 | 01/1901 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
2721 | 2786 | 01/1901 | SPM W |
St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
08/12/1949 | |
2721 | 2787 | 01/1901 | LLY W |
Llanelli Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
02/12/1949 | |
2721 | 2788 | 01/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 18/06/1947 | |
2721 | 2789 | 02/1901 | SED W |
Swansea East Dock Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1949 |
09/05/1949 | |
2721 | 2790 | 02/1901 | SLO SHL W |
Slough Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 06/1950 |
05/06/1950 | |
2721 | 2791 | 02/1901 | SRD W |
Stafford Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1950 |
10/04/1950 | |
2721 | 2792 | 02/1901 | DYD W |
Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1950 |
01/06/1950 | |
2721 | 2793 | 02/1901 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1948 |
17/01/1948 | |
2721 | 2794 | 02/1901 | NPT W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
30/11/1949 | |
2721 | 2795 | 02/1901 | NPT W |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
25/01/1949 | |
2721 | 2796 | 02/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 | |
2721 | 2797 | 03/1901 | NEA W |
Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1948 |
07/06/1948 | |
2721 | 2798 | 03/1901 | DG DYD DG DYD W |
Danygraig Duffryn Yard Danygraig Duffryn Yard Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/06/1948 07/08/1948 26/02/1949 11/1949 |
02/11/1949 | |
2721 | 2799 | 03/1901 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1950 |
10/03/1950 |