Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 363 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11289 Week
» 104523 Month
» 564464 Year
» 5003901 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

CarR/GWR "CR-2" Class 0-6-0PT


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
681 02/1920 16/02/1955 35 607,497 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 05/11/1955 35.75
682 02/1920 05/10/1953 33.67
683 03/1920 20/12/1954 34.75 586,565 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 24/03/1956 36.05
684 03/1920 28/05/1954 34.17 580,770 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/05/1955 35.21