GWR Dean "655" Class 0-6-0ST
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/1928 | Condemned | 1778 | COND | ||||
03/1929 | Condemned | 655 | COND | ||||
03/1929 | Condemned | 1772 | COND | ||||
04/1929 | Condemned | 1781 | COND | ||||
10/1932 | Condemned | 1774 | COND | ||||
13/10/1934 | Condemned | 767 | 98W | COND | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1747 | LMTN | Leamington | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1775 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 1786 | SDN.2 | Chippenham | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2701 | TDU.1 | Bridgend | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2705 | WEY.1 | Bridport | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2706 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2710 | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2714 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 2717 | WLN | Wellington | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 1741 | WOS | Worcester | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 1746 | HFD.1 | Ledbury | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 1747 | LMTN | Leamington | TYS | Tyseley | |
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 1773 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
08/02/1936 | Reallocation | 1788 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 1745 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
01/1937 | Condemned | 1771 | COND | ||||
06/1938 | Condemned | 1776 | COND | ||||
07/1938 | Condemned | 1744 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 1775 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | COND | ||
12/1938 | Condemned | 1741 | WOS | Worcester | COND | ||
01/1940 | Condemned | 1783 | COND | ||||
07/1941 | Condemned | 1777 | COND | ||||
13/01/1945 | Condemned | 1779 | 98W | COND | |||
10/02/1945 | Condemned | 1784 | 98W | COND | |||
10/02/1945 | Condemned | 2705 | 98W | COND | |||
22/02/1945 | Condemned | 1743 | 98W | COND | |||
19/10/1945 | Condemned | 2718 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 1786 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 1788 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2701 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2703 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2710 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2711 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1945 | Condemned | 2720 | 98W | COND | |||
02/02/1946 | Condemned | 1748 | 98W | COND | |||
01/06/1946 | Condemned | 1746 | 98W | COND | |||
12/06/1946 | Condemned | 1750 | 98W | COND | |||
24/06/1946 | Condemned | 1790 | 98W | COND | |||
02/09/1946 | Condemned | 1785 | 98W | COND | |||
04/01/1947 | Condemned | 1787 | 98W | COND | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1742 | OXF | Oxford | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1745 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1747 | TYS | Tyseley | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1749 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1773 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1780 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1782 | TR | Truro | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 1789 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2702 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2704 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2706 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2707 | LLY | Llanelli | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2708 | TN | Taunton | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2709 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2712 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2713 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2714 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | HFD | Hereford | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2715 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2717 | WLN | Wellington | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 2719 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
10/05/1948 | Condemned | 2714 | 98W | COND | |||
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 2709 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
02/08/1948 | Condemned | 1780 | 98W | COND | |||
23/08/1948 | Condemned | 1745 | 98W | COND | |||
07/09/1948 | Condemned | 2709 | 98W | COND | |||
18/10/1948 | Condemned | 1749 | 98W | COND | |||
18/10/1948 | Condemned | 2706 | 98W | COND | |||
21/10/1948 | Condemned | 2717 | 98W | COND | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 2719 | TYS | Tyseley | WLN | Wellington | |
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 2719 | WLN | Wellington | TYS | Tyseley | |
06/07/1949 | Condemned | 2708 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 2719 | TYS | Tyseley | WLN | Wellington | |
12/09/1949 | Condemned | 2713 | 98W | COND | |||
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 2719 | WLN | Wellington | WLN | Wellington | |
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 2719 | WLN | Wellington | CNYD | Croes Newydd | |
09/01/1950 | Condemned | 2702 | 98W | COND | |||
27/02/1950 | Condemned | 1742 | 98W | COND | |||
14/03/1950 | Condemned | 2704 | 98W | COND | |||
16/03/1950 | Condemned | 1773 | 98W | COND | |||
28/03/1950 | Condemned | 2712 | 98W | COND | |||
26/05/1950 | Condemned | 1747 | 98W | COND | |||
15/07/1950 | Condemned | 2707 | 98W | COND | |||
17/07/1950 | Condemned | 2715 | 98W | COND | |||
18/10/1950 | Condemned | 1789 | 98W | COND | |||
03/11/1950 | Condemned | 1782 | 98W | COND | |||
06/11/1950 | Condemned | 2719 | 98W | COND |