Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1696 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19499 Week
» 72515 Month
» 192042 Year
» 3218895 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "655" Class 0-6-0ST
GWR |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
655
|
02/1892 |
|
03/1929 |
|
37.08 |
|
|
|
|
767
|
02/1892 |
|
13/10/1934 |
|
42.67 |
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Stafford Road, Wolverhampton) |
17/11/1934 |
42.78 |
1741
|
03/1892 |
|
12/1938 |
|
46.75 |
|
|
|
|
1742
|
03/1892 |
|
27/02/1950 |
|
57.92 |
|
|
|
|
1743
|
04/1892 |
|
22/02/1945 |
|
52.83 |
|
|
|
|
1744
|
04/1892 |
|
07/1938 |
|
46.25 |
|
|
|
|
1745
|
05/1892 |
|
23/08/1948 |
|
56.25 |
|
|
|
|
1746
|
06/1892 |
|
01/06/1946 |
|
54 |
|
|
|
|
1747
|
06/1892 |
|
26/05/1950 |
|
57.92 |
|
|
|
|
1748
|
07/1892 |
|
02/02/1946 |
|
53.58 |
|
|
|
|
1749
|
07/1892 |
|
18/10/1948 |
|
56.25 |
|
|
|
|
1750
|
08/1892 |
|
12/06/1946 |
|
53.83 |
|
|
|
|
1771
|
12/1892 |
|
01/1937 |
|
44.08 |
|
|
|
|
1772
|
12/1892 |
|
03/1929 |
|
36.25 |
|
|
|
|
1773
|
01/1893 |
|
16/03/1950 |
|
57.17 |
|
|
|
|
1774
|
02/1893 |
|
10/1932 |
|
39.67 |
|
|
|
|
1775
|
02/1893 |
|
10/1938 |
|
45.67 |
|
|
|
|
1776
|
03/1893 |
|
06/1938 |
|
45.25 |
|
|
|
|
1777
|
03/1893 |
|
07/1941 |
|
48.33 |
|
|
|
|
1778
|
04/1893 |
|
10/1928 |
|
35.5 |
|
|
|
|
1779
|
05/1893 |
|
13/01/1945 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
|
1780
|
05/1893 |
|
02/08/1948 |
|
55.25 |
|
|
|
|
1781
|
06/1893 |
|
04/1929 |
|
35.83 |
|
|
|
|
1782
|
08/1893 |
|
03/11/1950 |
|
57.25 |
|
|
|
|
1783
|
09/1893 |
|
01/1940 |
|
46.33 |
|
|
|
|
1784
|
10/1893 |
|
10/02/1945 |
|
51.33 |
|
|
|
|
1785
|
10/1893 |
|
02/09/1946 |
|
52.92 |
|
|
|
|
1786
|
11/1893 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
52 |
|
|
|
|
1787
|
11/1893 |
|
04/01/1947 |
|
53.17 |
|
|
|
|
1788
|
02/1894 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
51.75 |
|
|
|
|
1789
|
05/1894 |
|
18/10/1950 |
|
56.42 |
|
|
|
|
1790
|
06/1894 |
|
24/06/1946 |
|
52 |
|
|
|
|
2701
|
01/1896 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
49.83 |
|
|
|
|
2702
|
02/1896 |
|
09/01/1950 |
|
53.92 |
|
|
|
|
2703
|
02/1896 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
49.75 |
|
|
|
|
2704
|
03/1896 |
|
14/03/1950 |
|
54 |
|
|
|
|
2705
|
03/1896 |
|
10/02/1945 |
|
48.92 |
|
|
|
|
2706
|
04/1896 |
|
18/10/1948 |
|
52.5 |
|
|
|
|
2707
|
05/1896 |
|
15/07/1950 |
|
54.17 |
|
|
|
|
2708
|
06/1896 |
|
06/07/1949 |
|
53.08 |
|
|
|
|
2709
|
06/1896 |
|
07/09/1948 |
|
52.25 |
|
|
|
|
2710
|
06/1896 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
49.42 |
|
|
|
|
2711
|
07/1896 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
49.33 |
|
|
|
|
2712
|
08/1896 |
|
28/03/1950 |
|
53.58 |
|
|
|
|
2713
|
09/1896 |
|
12/09/1949 |
|
53 |
|
|
|
|
2714
|
09/1896 |
|
10/05/1948 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
|
2715
|
10/1896 |
|
17/07/1950 |
|
53.75 |
|
|
|
|
2716
|
11/1896 |
|
0000 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
2717
|
11/1896 |
|
21/10/1948 |
|
51.92 |
|
|
|
|
2718
|
12/1896 |
|
19/10/1945 |
|
48.83 |
|
|
|
|
2719
|
12/1896 |
|
06/11/1950 |
|
53.92 |
|
|
|
|
2720
|
02/1897 |
|
03/11/1945 |
|
48.75 |
|
|
|
|