655 |
655
|
02/1892 |
03/1929 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1920 |
655 |
1741
|
03/1892 |
12/1938 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1919 |
655 |
1743
|
04/1892 |
22/02/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
01/1920 |
655 |
1744
|
04/1892 |
07/1938 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1921 |
655 |
1746
|
06/1892 |
01/06/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1915 |
655 |
1747
|
06/1892 |
26/05/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1927 |
655 |
1748
|
07/1892 |
02/02/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1927 |
655 |
1749
|
07/1892 |
18/10/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1920 |
655 |
1750
|
08/1892 |
12/06/1946 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1920 |
655 |
1773
|
01/1893 |
16/03/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1927 |
655 |
1775
|
02/1893 |
10/1938 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1925 |
655 |
1776
|
03/1893 |
06/1938 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1929 |
655 |
1779
|
05/1893 |
13/01/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1926 |
655 |
1781
|
06/1893 |
04/1929 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1918 |
655 |
1782
|
08/1893 |
03/11/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1927 |
655 |
1784
|
10/1893 |
10/02/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
02/1918 |
655 |
1786
|
11/1893 |
03/11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
04/1924 |
655 |
1787
|
11/1893 |
04/01/1947 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
12/1924 |
655 |
1789
|
05/1894 |
18/10/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1917 |
655 |
2701
|
01/1896 |
03/11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1920 |
655 |
2707
|
05/1896 |
15/07/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
11/1921 |
655 |
2708
|
06/1896 |
06/07/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
07/1925 |
655 |
2709
|
06/1896 |
07/09/1948 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1920 |
655 |
2710
|
06/1896 |
03/11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1920 |
655 |
2711
|
07/1896 |
03/11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
06/1923 |
655 |
2712
|
08/1896 |
28/03/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
09/1925 |
655 |
2713
|
09/1896 |
12/09/1949 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1927 |
655 |
2715
|
10/1896 |
17/07/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1920 |
655 |
2716
|
11/1896 |
0000 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
03/1924 |
655 |
2719
|
12/1896 |
06/11/1950 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
05/1934 |
655 |
2720
|
02/1897 |
03/11/1945 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
10/1921 |