Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 70 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 21240 Month
» 21240 Year
» 1686616 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BaR/GWR "B" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
BARB 198 12/1898 W Withdrawn 01/1948 10/01/1948
BARB 212 05/1889 W Withdrawn 07/1948 10/07/1948
BARB 213 05/1889 W Withdrawn 01/1949 03/01/1949
BARB 231 02/1890 W Withdrawn 10/1949 31/10/1949