Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4601 Week
» 29435 Month
» 63767 Year
» 1729143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BaR/GWR "B" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/01/1948 Condemned 198 98W     COND  
10/07/1948 Condemned 212 98W     COND  
03/01/1949 Condemned 213 98W     COND  
31/10/1949 Condemned 231 98W     COND