Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 63 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4978 Week
» 16215 Month
» 249135 Year
» 1914511 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BaR/GWR "B" Class 0-6-2T


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
198 12/1898 10/01/1948 49.08
212 05/1889 10/07/1948 59.17
213 05/1889 03/01/1949 59.67
231 02/1890 31/10/1949 Barry 59.67