BaR/GWR "B1" Class 0-6-2T
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARB1 | 238 | 06/1890 | CDF W |
Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1948 |
25/06/1948 |
BARB1 | 240 | 07/1890 | RYR CV.BRY W |
Radyr Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/04/1949 03/1951 |
27/03/1951 |
BARB1 | 246 | 03/1892 | RYR W |
Radyr Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
03/01/1949 |
BARB1 | 248 | 03/1892 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1948 |
10/07/1948 |
BARB1 | 258 | 12/1894 | CV.BRY CV.BRY W |
Barry Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/04/1949 11/1949 |
24/11/1949 |
BARB1 | 259 | 12/1894 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1948 |
30/08/1948 |
BARB1 | 261 | 05/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1948 |
16/08/1948 |
BARB1 | 262 | 05/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1950 |
20/03/1950 |
BARB1 | 263 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1951 |
09/03/1951 |
BARB1 | 265 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
29/11/1949 |
BARB1 | 267 | 06/1900 | RYR CHYS CV.BRY W |
Radyr Cardiff Cathays Barry Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 03/1951 |
27/03/1951 |
BARB1 | 268 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 |
BARB1 | 269 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1949 |
10/10/1949 |
BARB1 | 270 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1951 |
06/04/1951 |
BARB1 | 271 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1951 |
06/04/1951 |
BARB1 | 272 | 06/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1950 |
20/03/1950 |
BARB1 | 274 | 03/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1951 |
17/04/1951 |
BARB1 | 275 | 04/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 |
BARB1 | 276 | 04/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1951 |
15/04/1951 |
BARB1 | 277 | 04/1900 | CV.BRY W |
Barry Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1949 |
06/05/1949 |