Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 258 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 15472 Month
» 248392 Year
» 1913768 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

BaR/GWR "B1" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
24/04/1948 Condemned 268 98W     COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 275 98W     COND  
25/06/1948 Condemned 238 98W     COND  
10/07/1948 Condemned 248 98W     COND  
16/08/1948 Condemned 261 98W     COND  
30/08/1948 Condemned 259 98W     COND  
03/01/1949 Condemned 246 98W     COND  
23/04/1949 Reallocation 240     BRY Barry  
23/04/1949 Reallocation 258     BRY Barry  
06/05/1949 Condemned 277 98W     COND  
10/10/1949 Condemned 269 98W     COND  
24/11/1949 Condemned 258 98W     COND  
29/11/1949 Condemned 265 98W     COND  
20/03/1950 Condemned 262 98W     COND  
20/03/1950 Condemned 272 98W     COND  
09/03/1951 Condemned 263 98W     COND  
27/03/1951 Condemned 240 98W     COND  
27/03/1951 Condemned 267 98W     COND  
06/04/1951 Condemned 270 98W     COND  
06/04/1951 Condemned 271 98W     COND  
15/04/1951 Condemned 276 98W     COND  
17/04/1951 Condemned 274 98W     COND