BMJR/GWR Dunbar "Unclass" Class 0-6-2T
Class | BMR | GWR (1st) | GWR (2nd) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
B_M | 36 | 11 | 421 | 12/1909 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
17/01/1949 |
B_M | 37 | 21 | 422 | 12/1909 | STJ W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1950 |
12/06/1950 |
B_M | 38 | 332 | 423 | 12/1909 | STJ W |
Severn Tunnel Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
09/12/1949 |
B_M | 39 | 504 | 424 | 01/1910 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1948 |
10/01/1948 |
B_M | 40 | 698 | 425 | 03/1914 | PILL CDF W |
Newport Pill Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 28/01/1950 01/1951 |
20/02/1951 |
B_M | 41 | 888 | 426 | 03/1914 | PILL LTS PILL LTS PILL LTS W |
Newport Pill Llantrisant Newport Pill Llantrisant Newport Pill Llantrisant Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 24/01/1948 31/05/1948 10/07/1948 04/09/1948 30/10/1948 03/1950 |
21/03/1950 |
B_M | 42 | 1084 | 04/1914 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1947 |
14/11/1947 | |
B_M | 43 | 1113 | 428 | 04/1914 | PILL W |
Newport Pill Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 08/1950 |
11/08/1950 |