Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 685 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 19753 Month
» 252673 Year
» 1918049 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Jenkins "RRM" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR RR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
RRM 33   30/08/1904 W Withdrawn 02/1951 06/02/1951
RRM 47   06/1904 W Withdrawn 04/1949 18/04/1949
RRM 51 110 08/1904 W Withdrawn 18/10/1948 25/10/1948