Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1037 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 1037 Month
» 67899 Year
» 1733275 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Jenkins "RRM" Class 0-6-2T


GWR RR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Mileage Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
33 30/08/1904 06/02/1951 46.5
47 06/1904 18/04/1949 44.83
51 110 08/1904 25/10/1948 44.17 689,280 44.39