Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1025 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 4414 Week
» 23315 Month
» 23315 Year
» 1688691 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRR" Class 0-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/05/1949 Condemned 30 98W     COND  
24/11/1949 Condemned 34 98W     COND  
20/02/1950 Condemned 32 98W     COND  
10/07/1950 Condemned 46 98W     COND  
09/03/1951 Condemned 31 98W     COND