Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 790 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6190 Week
» 24242 Month
» 257162 Year
» 1922538 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

RR/GWR Hurry Riches "RRAP" Class 0-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
RRAP 78 08/1921 88B
W
Cardiff East Dock
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
08/1955
02/08/1955
RRAP 79 08/1921 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
19/06/1954
07/1955
21/07/1955
RRAP 80 11/1921 88A
W
Cardiff Cathays
Withdrawn
25/11/1953
02/1954
01/02/1954
RRAP 81 11/1921 W Withdrawn 05/1954 17/05/1954